1ST THE QUEEN'S DRAGOON GUARDS REGIMENTAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Grants are made to help promote the efficiency of the Regiment, for the relief in need of all past and present members of the Regiment or its predecessors and their wives and widows, and for the advancement of education in respect of the history of the Regiment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 28 November 1977: Standard registration
- 27 January 2017: Funds received from 262628-1 1ST KING'S DRAGOON GUARDS OLD COMRADES' ASSOCIATIO...
- 27 January 2017: Funds received from 262628-2 PATRICK CHRYSTAL MEMORIAL FUND
- 27 January 2017: Funds received from 262628-3 THE QUEEN'S BAYS COMRADES CHARITABLE ASSOCIATION F...
- 27 January 2017: Funds received from 262628 1ST QUEEN'S DRAGOON GUARDS REGIMENTAL ASSOCIATION ...
- QUEEN'S DRAGOON GUARDS REGIMENTAL TRUST (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALEXANDER FREDERICK JAMES ROE | Chair | 26 November 2015 |
|
|||||
Colonel Timothy Robert Wilson OBE | Trustee | 23 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Alexander Warner | Trustee | 14 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mark Ashley-Miller | Trustee | 14 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Brigadier Alan Richmond OBE | Trustee | 23 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
JONATHAN DENIS BEATSON-HIRD | Trustee | 21 September 2017 |
|
|||||
COLONEL PATRICK JOHN ANDREWS OBE | Trustee | 24 October 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £167.86k | £142.44k | £175.06k | £192.08k | £190.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £183.63k | £104.98k | £115.47k | £164.08k | £151.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 23 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 10 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED EXECUTED 31 OCTOBER 1977 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 24 OCT 2016
Charitable objects
1) FOR PROMOTING THE EFFICIENCY OF THE REGIMENT. 2) FOR THE RELIEF IN NEED (BY MAKING PROVISION FOR THEIR ASSISTANCE) OF ALL PAST AND PRESENT MEMBERS OF THE REGIMENT OR ITS PREDECESSORS AND ALSO THE WIVES WIDOWS (WHETHER OR NOT REMARRIED) ISSUE OR DEPENDANTS OF SUCH MEMBERS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS. 3) FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
1st The Queen's Dragoon Guards Regimental Trust
Home HHQ QDG
Maindy Barracks
Cardiff
CF14 3YE
- Phone:
- 02920781213
- Email:
- Oliver.Larminie@NewtonIM.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window