Financial history 2ND UXBRIDGE (ST MARGARETS) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 274788
Charity reporting is up to date (66 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £33.93k £45.35k £45.35k £41.09k £44.05k
Total expenditure £41.12k £31.16k £31.13k £48.08k £52.79k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £21.16k N/A N/A N/A