Trustees CROSSWAYS COUNSELLING SERVICE
Charity number: 275053

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr SIMON DUNBAR | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Bethany Gorniak | Trustee | 05 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
John Robini | Trustee | 29 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Abigail Victoria White | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Jack Robson | Trustee | 09 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Justin Manley-Cooper | Trustee | 01 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Carolyn Susan Cowdrey | Trustee | 15 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
TESSA VIVIENNE TROLLOPE | Trustee | 18 February 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.