Accounts and annual returns BARRIE BADLAND TRUST

Charity number: 275063
Charity reporting is overdue by 90 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 90 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 90 days
Annual return 05 April 2023 28 June 2024 144 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2022 30 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 07 March 2022 30 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2020 06 April 2021 127 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 Not Required