Trustees THE FRIENDS OF BARKWAY PARISH CHURCH
Charity number: 275064

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicholas William Sackville Tufton | Chair | 25 February 2016 |
|
|||||
Rev Mark Bridgen | Trustee | 21 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Corrine Peters | Trustee | 11 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
James Wylie | Trustee | 07 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Mirjam Foot | Trustee | 07 March 2019 |
|
|||||
Mike Coomes | Trustee | 01 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
William MacKay | Trustee | 25 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW LAING | Trustee | 24 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
WILL NICOLSON | Trustee | 04 August 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.