EXE VALLEY GROUP OF YOUNG FARMERS' CLUBS

Charity Number: 275218
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

THE PROVISION OF POSITIVE ACTIVITIES FOR RURAL YOUNG PEOPLE AGED 10 TO 28

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £3,668
Total expenditure: £3,365

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Devon

Governance

Registration history:
  • 06 July 1978: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • TIVERTON GROUP OF YOUNG FARMERS' CLUBS (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Alexander Rodd Chair 01 September 2022
None on record
Sophie Pratt Trustee 01 September 2022
THE DEVON FEDERATION OF YOUNG FARMERS CLUBS
Received: On time
Ellen Tapp Trustee 01 September 2021
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £1.99k £879 £731 £1.03k £3.67k
Total expenditure £1.31k £1.83k £986 £2.86k £3.37k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 30 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 28 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 24 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 12 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 04 February 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Amory Building
Cheriton Bishop
EXETER
EX6 6JH
Phone:
0164724120
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available