Financial history THE DYRONS JOURNAL FOR THE VISUALLY HANDICAPPED OF TEIGNBRIDGE

Charity number: 275340
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £465 £400 £560 £344 £1.24k
Total expenditure £918 £243 £646 £694 £1.23k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A