WHIPTON COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advancing education and social welfare through providing and managing a community centre for recreation and leisure time occupation with the object of primarily benefitting the inhabitants of Whipton, Exeter, and those individuals accessing the clubs, groups and utilising the centre as a venue. At present, regular groups using the hall include music, art and social clubs, groups supporting needs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Devon
Governance
- 18 May 1978: Standard registration
No other names
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Emma Spiller | Trustee | 31 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Dalvi | Trustee | 23 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kerry Gamson | Trustee | 23 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tom Howourth | Trustee | 26 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mark Bodell | Trustee | 20 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Bodell | Trustee | 22 November 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.38k | £13.64k | £19.31k | £24.90k | £52.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.67k | £12.73k | £23.40k | £28.02k | £45.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £3.80k | £1.40k | £1.10k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 28 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 28 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 24 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 20 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 20 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 22 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 7TH DECEMBER 1977
Charitable objects
A) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF WHIPTON AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. B) TO ESTABLISH OR TO SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAITAIN AND MANAGE SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE ASSOCIATON AND ITS CONSTITUENT BODIES IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
WHIPTON AND NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Whipton Community Hall
Pinhoe Road
Exeter
EX4 8AF
- Phone:
- 07458 306891
- Email:
- admin@whiptonhall.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window