THE MILDENHALL VILLAGE HALL ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity's objective is to hold a village hall on trust for the use of the inhabitants of the Parish of Mildenhall in Wiltshire.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 23 October 1978: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mr Rob Bailey | Chair | 13 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Foard | Trustee | 29 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Andrew Wingate Napper | Trustee | 08 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
SUSANNA SARAH WESLEY LAMB | Trustee | 22 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
MILLY CARMICHAEL | Trustee | 13 November 2014 |
|
|||||
MRS LYNN SCHOLEFIELD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.75k | £12.41k | £25.15k | £11.37k | £10.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.23k | £13.25k | £13.53k | £11.79k | £7.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £18.36k | £3.17k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 02 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 02 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 02 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 08 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 12TH JULY 1978
Charitable objects
A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF MILDENHALL WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF MILDENHALL
Contact information
- Address:
-
FAIRVIEW
MILDENHALL
MARLBOROUGH
SN8 2LP
- Phone:
- 01672288076
- Email:
- minalbookings@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window