Financial history BRITISH MEXICAN SOCIETY

Charity number: 276830
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £4.91k £8.01k £3.37k £3.05k £6.51k
Total expenditure £5.07k £3.10k £2.30k £8.22k £3.51k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A