CTF TRAINING
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To support charity projects having beneficiaries mostly from geographical areas linked with CTFs past operations in North/Mid England and Wales. In this respect the operational base of the supported charity projects is irrelevant. The projects must have objectives to advance the education and welfare of young persons, advance the education of persons of any age and to assist unemployed persons.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 22 March 1979: Standard registration
- 21 April 2023: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- COMMUNITY TASK FORCE (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.31k | £1.15k | £745 | £82 | £2.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.50k | £5.26k | £4.48k | £7.93k | £9.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | |||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | |||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | |||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | |||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORP. 25 JANUARY 1979 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS PASSED 14 AUGUST 1986,16 JULY 1982,6 APRIL 1988,3 MAY 1989, 6 SEPTEMBER 1990 AND 25TH AUGUST 1993
Charitable objects
(I) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PERSONS BY PROVIDING VOCATIONAL TRAINING AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SUCH YOUNG PERSONS. (II) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PERSONS OF ANY AGE BY PROVIDING VOCATIONAL TRAINING,RETRAINING, AND LIMITED PERIODS OF WORK EXPERIENCE. (III) TO ASSIST UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE OF WHATEVER AGE TO FIND EMPLOYMENT BY THE PROVISION OF VOCATIONAL TRAINING, RETRAINING AND LIMITED PERIODS OF WORK EXPERIENCE AND IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) THROUGH ANY GOVERNMENT SPONSORED OR APPROVED PROGRAMMES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window