Financial history THE OTHONA COMMUNITY

Charity number: 277843
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £150.97k £71.86k £65.79k £86.74k £135.68k
Total expenditure £52.69k £71.47k £72.57k £99.95k £112.91k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £15.00k £10.00k £12.00k