Financial history GUILDFORD DIOCESAN GUILD OF CHURCH BELL RINGERS BELL RESTORATION FUND

Charity number: 278025
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £7.61k £7.39k £8.10k £11.36k £12.53k
Total expenditure £18.01k £4.16k £11.50k £1.13k £2.10k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A