Financial history The Leathersellers' Foundation

Charity Number: 278072
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £2.03m £1.66m £1.94m £1.66m £1.86m
Total expenditure £3.87m £3.73m £3.87m £3.84m £4.05m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £263.00k £172.00k £264.00k £206.00k £380.00k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.77m £1.49m £1.67m £1.45m £1.48m
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.46m £3.29m £3.66m £3.58m £3.77m
Expenditure - Raising funds £403.00k £447.00k £208.00k £256.00k £281.00k
Expenditure - Governance £11.00k £11.00k £12.00k £16.00k £15.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £3.23m £3.02m £3.05m £2.92m £3.10m
Expenditure - Investment management £165.00k £193.00k £208.00k £256.00k £281.00k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0