Financial history BERKHAMSTED MARKET FUND

Charity number: 278458
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £57.76k £42.41k £53.78k £58.88k £55.56k
Total expenditure £6.77k £5.18k £5.95k £5.59k £5.93k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A