DEAKIN SCHOLARSHIP FUND

Charity number: 278562
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

to provide small scholarships to students, of ISA schools, in need of financial assistance.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £16,115

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 29 November 1979: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JOHN ROBERT WOOD Trustee 05 December 2022
LEVENS VILLAGE HALL
Received: On time
Lake District Music Limited
Received: On time
Dr Sarah Jane Lockyer Trustee 26 November 2022
None on record
Richard Michael Walden Trustee 16 January 2020
None on record
Elizabeth Ann Brown Trustee 16 January 2020
None on record
James Thomas Wilding BA FRSA Trustee 16 January 2020
THE INDEPENDENT SCHOOLS ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
Kaye Marilyn Lovejoy Trustee 05 December 2019
None on record
Helen Chalmers Trustee 05 December 2019
None on record
Angela Culley Trustee 31 August 2017
THE KING'S SCHOOL OF THE CATHEDRAL CHURCH OF CANTERBURY
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £51.21k £9 £10 £25.00k £0
Total expenditure £8.18k £37.95k £25.74k £16.70k £16.11k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 21 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 27 March 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 25 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 22 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 30 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 30 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
I S A House
5-7 Great Chesterford Court
Great Chesterford
SAFFRON WALDEN
CB10 1PF
Phone:
01799523619
Website:

No information available