Financial history THE FRIENDS OF WROTHAM RECREATIONAL GROUND

Charity number: 279746
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £19.99k £229 £1.50k £27.81k £374
Total expenditure £14.59k £3.29k £11.03k £14.00k £9.41k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A