CAISTER ON SEA COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The CCA manages the Caister Community Centre. Local community based groups and organisations use the facilities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
Total income includes £1,658 from 1 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Norfolk
Governance
- 15 May 1980: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Alan Creed | Chair | 13 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Raymond Banwell | Trustee | 13 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Ivins | Trustee | 13 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Kenneth Shackleford | Trustee | 13 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Elizabeth Creed | Trustee | 13 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Neil Holland | Trustee | 13 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mark Trudgill | Trustee | 13 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jillian B Hopping | Trustee | 13 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sally Ann Brown | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Jackson | Trustee | 04 October 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £69.52k | £31.14k | £27.29k | £58.25k | £72.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £55.60k | £51.76k | £43.02k | £63.64k | £82.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £19.21k | £2.67k | £1.66k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 12 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 12 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 29 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 29 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 29 November 2022 | 364 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 29 November 2022 | 364 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 07 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 07 August 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17/03/1980 AS AMENDED ON 20/11/1997 AS AMENDED ON 15/04/2010 as amended on 16 Apr 2024
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE ASSOCIATION ARE TO: A) PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, NATIONALITY, AGE, DISABILITY, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE STATUTORY AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS; B) ESTABLISH, OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF, A COMMUNITY CENTRE (HEREAFTER CALLED “THE CENTRE”) AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME (WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY OR OTHER PERSON OR BODY) IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS; C) PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED. THE ASSOCIATION SHALL BE NON-PARTY IN POLITICS AND NON-SECTARIAN IN RELIGION. THE AREA OF BENEFIT SHALL BE CAISTER ON SEA AND WEST CAISTER AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD.
Area of benefit
CAISTER ON SEA, WEST CAISTER AND NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
BEACH ROAD
CAISTER-ON-SEA
GREAT YARMOUTH
NORFOLK
NR30 5ER
- Phone:
- 01493 720835
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window