Financial history THE DEVON HORSE AND PONY SANCTUARY

Charity number: 280784
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £273.41k £127.94k £55.50k £159.18k £179.52k
Total expenditure £120.72k £140.25k £79.55k £98.97k £166.12k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A