Financial history THE INSTITUTE OF GROUP ANALYSIS

Charity Number: 280942
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £629.60k £570.29k £632.19k £589.15k £519.94k
Total expenditure £440.55k £490.09k £615.79k £649.77k £615.52k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £26.83k N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £113.65k £300 £6.30k £26.35k £15.78k
Income - Other trading activities £31.34k £5.65k £18.84k £31.49k £29.61k
Income - Charitable activities £482.48k £560.81k £605.35k £529.37k £472.77k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £2.13k £1.11k £1.70k £1.95k £1.79k
Income - Other £0 £2.42k £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £110.65k £0 £0 £17.35k £2.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £440.55k £490.09k £615.79k £649.77k £615.52k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £8.29k £8.29k £11.88k £9.96k £10.38k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0