Financial history ELANORE LIMITED

Charity number: 281047
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £69.79k £60.28k £67.63k £67.63k £67.63k
Total expenditure £82.95k £73.17k £27.32k £110.58k £71.28k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A