Financial history INTERNATIONAL TRUST FOR NATURE CONSERVATION

Charity number: 281101
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022
Total gross income £1.02k £46 £71 £22 £8
Total expenditure £0 £2.06k £2.06k £69 £96
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A