FRENCHAY VILLAGE HALL CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of rooms and facilities for hire to local and private users in the Frenchay district of Bristol and beyond. Occasional use as a blood donor centre and polling station for local and general elections.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Bristol City
- South Gloucestershire
Governance
- 14 November 1980: Standard registration
- FRENCHAY VILLAGE HALL (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elaine Margaret Stiddard | Trustee | 01 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Roma Widger | Trustee | 25 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Keith Brian Shurlock | Trustee | 27 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Geoffrey Colin Pinner | Trustee | 25 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Clare Kinsey | Trustee | 23 September 2019 |
|
|||||
Charles Alexander Pye Watkins | Trustee | 22 July 2019 |
|
|||||
Alex Parry | Trustee | 26 March 2018 |
|
|||||
Karen Morrison | Trustee | 01 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Foley | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Matt Grant | Trustee | 30 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE ROSEMARY COLE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £41.03k | £38.19k | £34.94k | £36.33k | £45.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.26k | £20.43k | £20.55k | £24.77k | £28.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £12.18k | £25.70k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 14 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 14 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 14 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 14 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 30 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 30 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 20 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 20 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 31 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 31 March 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
LEASE AND TRUST DEED DATED 30TH APRIL 1980
Charitable objects
A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF FRENCHAY WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
THE PARISH OF FRENCHAY
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 STANSHAW CLOSE
BRISTOL
BS16 1JY
- Phone:
- 01179566870
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window