Accounts and annual returns THE CHAPTER OF FAITH FOR DUTY BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 281233
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 12 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 12 days
Annual return 30 June 2023 16 July 2024 77 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2022 26 January 2024 271 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 05 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 05 December 2021 219 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required