Financial history THE LATE MISS DORIS EVELYN CLARKE'S CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 281282
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 06/07/2020 06/07/2021 06/07/2022 06/07/2023 06/07/2024
Total gross income £12.32k £4.41k £6.97k £7.32k £24.81k
Total expenditure £12.83k £6.42k £12.20k £20.33k £19.95k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A