Trustees BEDFORDSHIRE FAMILY HISTORY SOCIETY
Charity number: 281677

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Tresidder | Chair | 01 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Lisa Richardson | Trustee | 07 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Fraser | Trustee | 09 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Lang | Trustee | 10 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Claire Sowah | Trustee | 10 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
William Kerr Clement | Trustee | 01 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Edward Friend | Trustee | 06 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Cathy Friend | Trustee | 06 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
MARY WOOLDRIDGE | Trustee | 07 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
Paul Reginald Woodcraft | Trustee | 07 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
Brian Michael Payne | Trustee | 01 June 1996 |
|
|
||||
PETER LEONARD FREDERICK SHARP | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.