Financial history THE FRIENDS OF ST MARGARET'S CHURCH, WELLOW

Charity number: 281844
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £459 £67 £566 £848 £768
Total expenditure £0 £270 £0 £0 £1.42k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A