THE BIBLE LEAGUE TRUST

Charity number: 281867
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

THE OBJECT OF THE BIBLE LEAGUE TRUST IS THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION BY THE PROCLAMATION AND FURTHERANCE OF THE GOSPEL OF GOD CONCERNING HIS SON JESUS CHRIST OUR LORD AND THE PREACHING AND TEACHING OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH THROUGHOUT THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE. THE BIBLE LEAGUE TRUST PRODUCES LITERATURE, WHICH IS SENT WORLDWIDE, AND HOLDS PUBLIC MEETINGS THROUGHOUT THE UNITED KINGDOM.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £24,571
Total expenditure: £26,237

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 06 April 1981: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev NEIL PFEIFFER Chair 14 November 2005
None on record
Jason Allan Pallister Trustee 08 April 2024
None on record
Daniel Tribe Trustee 06 November 2023
None on record
Robert John Hooper Trustee 19 May 2021
THE GOSPEL MAGAZINE TRUST
Received: On time
Rev JONATHAN DAVID MUNDAY Trustee 17 April 2017
THE CHRISTIAN WORSHIP PUBLISHING TRUST
Received: On time
DAVID JOHN BUTLER Trustee 17 April 2010
THE MARTYRS MEMORIAL, RAYLEIGH, ESSEX
Received: On time
BIBLE SPREADING UNION
Received: 4 days late
REV A J LEWIS Trustee 14 May 2009
None on record
Pooyan Mehrshahi Trustee 12 May 2009
THE PROTESTANT TRUTH SOCIETY (INC)
Received: On time
SALISBURY REFORMED SEMINARY
Received: On time
PROVIDENCE BAPTIST CHAPEL, CHELTENHAM
Received: On time
Stephen Albert Toms Trustee 08 January 1981
BIBLE SPREADING UNION
Received: 4 days late
THE SOVEREIGN GRACE ADVENT TESTIMONY
Received: On time
REV J P THACKWAY Trustee
HOLYWELL EVANGELICAL CHURCH
Received: On time
THE CHRISTIAN WORSHIP PUBLISHING TRUST
Received: On time
THE TRINITARIAN BIBLE SOCIETY
Received: On time
EMMANUEL CHURCH (SALISBURY)
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £19.39k £16.93k £20.51k £17.21k £24.57k
Total expenditure £20.97k £35.10k £20.50k £19.34k £26.24k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 29 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 15 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 18 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 20 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 01 May 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
30 Neville Close
SALISBURY
SP1 3EH
Phone:
07494312823