GREENCOMBE GARDEN TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To permit the property to be used as and for a garden and arboretum for the enjoyment of the public and for the purpose of research by the growth and propagation of trees and plants with a view to the furtherance of the study and science of botany and the conservation of the nature and the increase of knowledge in respect thereof and the improvement of the methods and practice of horticulture.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Somerset
Governance
- 04 February 1981: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert Kirbye Schmidt | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Kim-Nora Moses | Trustee | 01 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
JAMES GORDON SHUTE HARRIS | Trustee |
|
||||||
NIGEL ANTHONY ROWLAND | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JANIE AVA ANNE GONNE CLIFFORD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.68k | £18.89k | £12.02k | £12.85k | £11.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £39.37k | £29.84k | £33.82k | £33.40k | £28.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 02 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 03 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 06 February 2023 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 07 February 2022 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 04 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 1ST DECEMBER 1980
Charitable objects
TO PERMIT THE PROPERTY TO BE USED AS AND FOR A GARDEN AND ARBORETUM FOR THE ENJOYMENT OF THE PUBLIC AND FOR THE PURPOSE OF RESEARCH BY THE GROWTH AND PROPAGATION OF TREES AND PLANTS WITH A VIEW TO THE FURTHERANCE OF THE STUDY AND SCIENCE OF BOTANY AND THE CONSERVATION OF THE NATURE AND THE INCREASE OF KNOWLEDGE IN RESPECT THEREOF AND THE IMPROVEMENT OF THE METHODS AND PRACTICE OF HORTICULTURE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Greencombe
Porlock Weir Road
Porlock
MINEHEAD
Somerset
TA24 8NU
- Phone:
- 01643862363
- Email:
- info@greencombe.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window