THE BRISTOL BUILDINGS PRESERVATION TRUST LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To preserve for the benefit of the people of Bristol and the nation at large, whatever of the English historical, architectural and constructional heritage may exist in and around the City of Bristol in the form of buildings of particular beauty or historial, architectural or constructional interest or ancient monuments.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Bristol City
Governance
- 27 March 1981: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alderman Royston Alan Griffey JP | Trustee | 07 April 2025 |
|
|||||
John Russ Leith | Trustee | 07 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Brenda Massey | Trustee | 03 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Councillor Anthony Negus | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SUSAN JULIET CRANE SMITH-UNCLES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Lesley Ann Alexander | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £165 | £23 | £45 | £469 | £1.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 February 2025 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 February 2025 | 382 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 February 2025 | 747 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 March 2022 | 57 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 20 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 5TH MARCH 1981 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 26TH JANUARY 1982 AND 28TH NOVEMBE 1983 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16/06/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 16 FEB 2017
Charitable objects
TO PRESERVE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PEOPLE OF BRISTOL AND OF THE NATION AT LARGE, WHATEVER OF THE ENGLISH HISTORICAL, ARCHITECTURAL AND CONSTRUCTIONAL HERITAGE MAY EXIST IN AND AROUND THE CITY OF BRISTOL IN THE FORM OF BUILDINGS (WHICH EXPRESSION SHALL FOR THESE PURPOSES INCLUDE ANY BUILDING AS DEFINED BY SECTION 336(1) OF THE TOWN AND COUNTRY PLANNING ACT 1990 AND ALSO ANY GARDEN OR PLANT OR MACHINERY IRRESPECTIVE OF WHETHER IT IS ASSOCIATED WITH A BUILDING) OF PARTICULAR BEAUTY OR HISTORICAL, ARCHITECTURAL OR CONSTRUCTIONAL INTEREST OR ANCIENT MONUMENTS.
Area of benefit
CITY OF BRISTOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o Lib Dem Group Office
City Hall
College Green
Bristol
BS1 5TR
- Phone:
- 01173534713
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window