HAYLE DAY CARE CENTRE TRUST COMMITTEE

Charity number: 282402
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

A day care centre for the elderly providing day care and transport, hot meals, refreshments, personal care (including bathing facilities, hairdressing and podiatry), social interaction, entertainment and advice.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £213,094
Total expenditure: £200,767

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Cornwall

Governance

Registration history:
  • 17 June 1981: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • HAYLE DAY CARE CENTRE TRUST (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Bernadette MARKS Chair 21 June 2013
HAYLE DAY CARE CENTRE TRUST
Received: 11 days late
Tracey Nidds Trustee 26 January 2023
None on record
Dave Cupples Trustee 24 February 2021
None on record
NICK NAVRATIL Trustee 18 December 2013
CAMBORNE REDRUTH HAYLE METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
MARY LLOYD Trustee 23 November 2011
HAYLE DAY CARE CENTRE TRUST
Received: 11 days late
BRIAN CAPPER Trustee
HAYLE DAY CARE CENTRE TRUST
Received: 11 days late
HARVEY'S FOUNDRY TRUST
Received: On time
ANGARRACK COMMUNITY CENTRE
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £228.63k £447.10k £148.49k £161.02k £213.09k
Total expenditure £211.20k £153.33k £101.08k £169.87k £200.77k
Income from government contracts £11.02k £6.46k £3.94k £12.45k £26.35k
Income from government grants N/A £65.39k N/A £22.50k N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 20 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 20 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 09 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 09 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 03 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 03 January 2023 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2021 07 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 07 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 11 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 11 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
HAYLE DAY CARE CENTRE
COMMERCIAL ROAD
HAYLE
TR27 4DE
Phone:
01736755000
Website:

No information available