GATEHOUSE EDUCATIONAL TRUST LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Children of any race, colour, creed, background and intellect shall be accepted as students and work side by side without streaming or any kind of segregation, with the aim that each child shall get to know and love God, and to develop their own uniqueness of personality to enable them to appreciate the world and the world to appreciate them.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
Total income:
£8,437,823
Donations and legacies | £20.18k | |
Charitable activities | £8.41m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £10.79k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£7,579,276
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £7.58m | |
Other | £0 |
£10,791 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £7.58m | |
Retained for future use | £858.55k |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £7.58m | |
Retained for future use | £869.34k |
People

110 Employee(s)
11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£70k to £80k | 5 |
£80k to £90k | 1 |
£90k to £100k | 1 |
£120k to £130k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Essex
- Kent
- Throughout London
Governance
- 13 May 1981: Standard registration
- GATEHOUSE SCHOOL (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tanya Anouska Jamil | Trustee | 13 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sally Wells | Trustee | 06 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Francesco Curto | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Graham Ball | Trustee | 22 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emanuelle Whale | Trustee | 16 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Damien Adam Paul King | Trustee | 16 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Benjamin Pritchett-Brown | Trustee | 23 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rejpaul Bhumbra | Trustee | 06 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Hodgson | Trustee | 24 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Beck | Trustee | 11 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Scott | Trustee | 06 May 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.76m | £6.12m | £6.66m | £7.56m | £8.44m | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.14m | £5.29m | £6.28m | £6.91m | £7.58m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £72.52k | £11.75k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £81.11k | £23.88k | £5.00k | £28.00k | £20.18k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £5.67m | £6.10m | £6.66m | £7.53m | £8.41m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £6.37k | £20 | £17 | £447 | £10.79k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £5.14m | £5.29m | £6.28m | £6.91m | £7.58m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £18.69k | £23.31k | £0 | £25.62k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £8.75m | £8.69m | £8.39m | £8.08m | £7.75m | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £1.55m | £1.70m | £2.24m | £3.26m | £5.27m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £3.94m | £3.19m | £3.04m | £3.09m | £3.91m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 12 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 12 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 28 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 28 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 26 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 26 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 30 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 30 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 29/12/1980 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09/02/1981 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01/04/1981 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 08/05/1981 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04/03/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03/02/2015 as amended on 21 Jun 2021
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PERSONS BETWEEN THE AGES OF TWO AND NINETEEN. B, IN PARTICULAR, BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE FOREGOING TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN A SCHOOL FOR CHILDREN OF ALL RACES, CREEDS, SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES AND LEVELS OF INTELLECT AND ABILITY AND TO EDUCATE AND INSTRUCT THE CHILDREN INDIVIDUALLY AND TOGETHER, BUT WITHOUT STREAMING OR SEGREGATION, IN ORDER TO HELP THEM SO TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBER OF SOCIETY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
GATEHOUSE EDUCATIONAL TRUST
GATEHOUSE SCHOOL
SEWARDSTONE ROAD
LONDON
E2 9JG
- Phone:
- 02087095222
- Email:
- bursar@gatehouseschool.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window