ST KEYNE VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 282564
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Our village hall is warm and comfortable with a popular social club, opening at weekends and bank holidays raising vital funds. The hall hosts a weekly coffee morning, plus classes such as woodcrafters, pilates and Zumba. A bi-weekly baby and toddlers group. A book exchange venture is also proving popular plus a local Chiropody clinic.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024

Total income: £20,220
Total expenditure: £18,905

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Cornwall

Governance

Registration history:
  • 13 October 2006: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dominic Folland Trustee 19 March 2025
None on record
LAMBRINI FEATHERSTONE Trustee 19 March 2025
None on record
Stuart Houghton Trustee 12 November 2018
LISKEARD LIONS CLUB (CIO)
Received: On time
FRIENDS OF THE DARTMOOR HILL PONY
Received: 57 days late
LIONS CLUB OF LISKEARD CHARITABLE FUND
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £13.28k £21.86k £18.02k £17.23k £20.22k
Total expenditure £11.52k £8.09k £12.04k £11.85k £18.91k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £17.39k £4.42k N/A £3.00k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 10 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2023 20 November 2024 234 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2022 24 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2021 10 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2020 10 November 2021 224 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
CONVEYANCE AND TRUST DEED DATED 28 OCTOBER 1980
Charitable objects
A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF ST KEYNE WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.CHILD CARE WITHIN THE AREA OF EXETER AND ITS ENVIRONS.
Area of benefit
THE PARISH OF ST KEYNE
Registration history
  • 13 October 2006 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
St. Keyne Village Hall
Clemens Road
St. Keyne
Liskeard
Cornwall
PL14 4RF
Phone:
01579 347377