Financial history EMMANUEL TRUST

Charity number: 283001
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £9.26k £9.46k £9.46k £8.25k £9.53k
Total expenditure £13.94k £11.76k £13.65k £12.53k £20.71k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A