Financial history NORFOLK AND NORWICH OPERATIC SOCIETY

Charity Number: 283148
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £91.30k £22.42k £124.87k £197.55k £82.10k
Total expenditure £80.39k £9.40k £123.08k £160.38k £132.92k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £18.71k N/A N/A N/A