Financial history A W CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 283322
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £17.08m £16.43m £16.01m £21.86m £27.57m
Total expenditure £9.74m £13.94m £7.50m £19.89m £7.49m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £4.00m £10.00m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £17.08m £16.43m £16.01m £17.86m £17.57m
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £2.12k £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £5.70m £10.89m £5.24m £16.88m £5.57m
Expenditure - Raising funds £4.04m £3.05m £2.26m £3.01m £1.92m
Expenditure - Governance £274.23k £333.54k £20.67k £20.67k £20.70k
Expenditure - Grants institution £5.43m £10.56m £5.22m £16.86m £5.55m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £2.52m £1.55m
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £1.87k £0