Accounts and annual returns SUDBURY FESTIVAL OF PERFORMING ARTS

Charity number: 284215
Charity reporting is overdue by 61 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 61 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 61 days
Annual return 30 April 2023 24 March 2025 389 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2022 24 March 2025 755 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2021 04 May 2023 430 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2020 04 May 2023 795 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Not Required