Trustees THE SUTTON OLD PEOPLE'S WELFARE COMMITTEE
Charity number: 284231

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Reena Barai | Chair | 13 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
Carolyn O'connor | Trustee | 17 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
TONY PATTISON | Trustee | 17 March 2025 |
|
|||||
Dr Brendan Hudson | Trustee | 17 March 2025 |
|
|||||
Mark Woolfenden | Trustee | 17 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Simon Elliott | Trustee | 21 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Lily Psverukai Bande | Trustee | 23 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Tracey Karen Tibos | Trustee | 03 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
PAM NORTON | Trustee | 14 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
JOAN CROWHURST | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARILYN GORDON-JONES | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.