Financial history Helping Herts

Charity number: 284482
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £15.00k £24.87k £226.36k £303.58k £414.94k
Total expenditure £8.80k £30.45k £182.67k £240.52k £332.27k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A