DUKE-ELDER FUND

Charity number: 284632
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The International Duke Elder Medal was endowed by Lady Duke Elder in 1980. The Fund provides for the medal an oration and associated expenses. The medal is awarded 4 yearly to an ophthalmologist who has contributed most to the development of international relations and friendship between ophthalmologists, and who has advanced the field by contributions in writing and organization in ophthalmology.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024

Total income: £3,363
Total expenditure: £1,680

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 07 May 1983: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Investment
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MR NICK ASTBURY Chair
None on record
Anthony Khawaja FRCophth Trustee 30 November 2022
T F C FROST CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
Dr Tasanee Braithwaite Trustee 30 November 2022
None on record
Omar Abdul Rahman Mahroo FRCOPHTH Trustee 01 June 2019
None on record
MARK MERRILL Trustee 22 July 2014
Salisbury Hospice Charity Limited
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022 31/01/2023 31/01/2024
Total gross income £2.16k £2.88k £3.31k £3.46k £3.36k
Total expenditure £2.32k £2.29k £4.27k £2.70k £1.68k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2024 25 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2023 05 December 2023 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2022 25 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2021 12 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2020 04 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
RECTORY FARMHOUSE
THE STREET
SHOTESHAM ALL SAINTS
NORWICH
NR15 1YL
Phone:
01508550377
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available