THE HAMPSHIRE GENEALOGICAL SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promote the study of family history and provide information and education services to facilitate this study.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
120 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hampshire
Governance
- 17 May 1982: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anthony William Sinclair | Chair | 18 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan May Stannard | Trustee | 17 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jane Diana Elizabeth Painter | Trustee | 17 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Terence Arthur Gilmour | Trustee | 17 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Philip Michael Brown | Trustee | 10 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Eve Ranger | Trustee | 10 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kay Elisabeth Lovell | Trustee | 20 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
KEITH WILLIAM TURNER | Trustee | 18 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
ANGELA HELEN WINTERIDGE | Trustee | 08 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
ANN-MARIE SHEARER | Trustee | 08 October 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £48.09k | £47.94k | £46.25k | £77.35k | £42.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £62.11k | £40.86k | £50.30k | £36.89k | £47.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 18 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 12 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17TH APRIL 1982 AS AMENDED ON 8TH NOVEMBER 1992 AS AMENDED 28 MARCH 1998 AND 23 SEPTEMBER 2000 AS AMENDED ON 12 OCT 2018 as amended on 16 Jun 2018 as amended on 16 Jun 2018 as amended on 16 Jun 2018 as amended on 10 Oct 2020 as amended on 12 Jun 2021
Charitable objects
THE AIMS AND OBJECTIVES OF THE SOCIETY SHALL BE TO ADVANCE THE STUDY OF FAMILY HISTORY RESEARCH. IN FURTHERANCE OF THIS THE SOCIETY MAY: (A) COLLECT, PUBLISH, CO-ORDINATE AND MAKE ACCESSIBLE IN THE INTERESTS OF FAMILY HISTORY ANY DOCUMENTS OR RECORDS PARTICULARLY RELATING TO THE COUNTY OF HAMPSHIRE. (B) PROMOTE THE PRESERVATION AND PRESENTATION OF SUCH DOCUMENTS AND RECORDS. (C) HOLD LECTURES, OUTINGS, MEETINGS AND DISCUSSIONS, GIVE ADVICE AND GUIDANCE AND ISSUE PUBLICATIONS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
HAMPSHIRE RECORD OFFICE
SUSSEX STREET
WINCHESTER
SO23 8TH
- Phone:
- 07769 405195
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window