Financial history FRANCISCAN AID

Charity number: 285413
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £163.42k £55.74k £64.78k £62.66k £53.87k
Total expenditure £77.63k £98.54k £77.24k £78.68k £76.24k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A