Financial history THE STOLLER CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 285415
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £694.31k £2.66m £1.32m £1.68m £1.68m
Total expenditure £5.21m £1.32m £7.18m £1.75m £1.64m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £2.43m £610.04k £501.75k £496.95k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £475.72k £1.02m £1.10m
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £694.31k £230.28k £231.89k £161.35k £90.69k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £5.14m £1.25m £6.43m £581.13k £406.84k
Expenditure - Raising funds £73.83k £70.33k £751.92k £1.17m £1.24m
Expenditure - Governance £102.01k £89.83k £86.28k £94.33k £89.54k
Expenditure - Grants institution £5.03m £1.16m £6.34m £486.80k £317.31k
Expenditure - Investment management £73.83k £70.33k £48.99k £39.47k £20.12k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0