Financial history ILCHESTER AND DISTRICT COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 285483
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024 05/04/2025
Total gross income £427 £1.94k £2.46k £3.29k £3.57k
Total expenditure £1.55k £1.42k £1.78k £2.78k £3.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A