STUDLEY GREEN (TROWBRIDGE) COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1. To improve the living conditions and promote for the benefit of the inhabitants of the geographical area of Trowbridge: (a) the advancement of education and (b) the provision of facilities in the interest of social welfare. 2. The provision and maintenance of the Association's premises at Studley Green, Trowbridge. 3. The other advantages and benefits usually associated whose main object
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2022
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 11 September 1982: Standard registration
- STUDLEY GREEN COMMUNITY CENTRE (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joanne Gray | Chair | 30 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Craig Speakman | Trustee | 17 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard Culverhouse | Trustee | 30 December 2022 |
|
|||||
Tom Bazan | Trustee | 30 November 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2018 | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.52k | £12.93k | £9.32k | £2.95k | £16.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.93k | £11.50k | £9.35k | £7.83k | £13.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 354 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 354 days | |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 17 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 09 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 15 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 13 December 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 5TH AUGUST 1982 AS AMENDED 27 OCTOBER 1995
Charitable objects
(1) TO IMPROVE THE LIVING CONDITIONS AND PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE GEOGRAPHICAL AREA OF TROWBRIDGE: (A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION (B) THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE (2) THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF THE ASSOCIATION'S PREMISES AT STUDLEY GREEN TROWBRIDGE - SEE CL. 2
Area of benefit
STUDLEY GREEN ESTATE AND NEIGHBOURHOOD, TROWBRIDGE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Studley Green Community Centre
Lambrok Road
Studley Green
Trowbridge
BA14 9HA
- Phone:
- 01225769187
- Email:
- info@sgca.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window