Financial history ST PAUL'S WINCHMORE HILL TRUST

Charity Number: 285596
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £5.99k £5.19k £394.73k £26.61k £17.09k
Total expenditure £5.36k £5.36k £5.39k £75.30k £5.36k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A