Financial history SCOO-B-DOO SOCIETY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE SPECIAL BABYCARE UNIT OF THE GLOUCESTER ROYAL HOSPITAL

Charity number: 286167
Charity reporting is up to date (68 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022 28/02/2023 29/02/2024
Total gross income £84.15k £47.52k £58.67k £71.33k £45.66k
Total expenditure £61.96k £137.61k £51.02k £7.91k £76.30k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A