HEINRICH WOLFGANG DONNER SETTLEMENT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
For travelling scholarships or other financial aid to Nationals of Scandinavian Countries to assist and encourage them in research in English Literature and general education assistance as decided by the Governors of Abo Akademi University
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 19 January 1983: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.03k | £11.64k | £13.87k | £14.65k | £20.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.25k | £9.17k | £42.45k | £29.40k | £7.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 06 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 13 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 04 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF SETTLEMENT DATED 12TH MAY 1958
Charitable objects
I) IN THE PROVISION OF TRAVELLING SCHOLARSHIPS IN OTHER FINANCIAL AID TO NATIONALS OF THE SCANDINAVIAN COUNTRIES TO ASSIST AND ENCOURAGE THEM IN RESEARCH IN ENGLISH LITERATURE. II) IN AIDING AND ENCOURAGING THE PURCHASE BY EDUCATIONAL INSTITUTIONS IN THE SCANDINAVIAN COUNTRIES OF BOOKS AND OTHER MATERIALS WHICH WILL BE USEFUL FOR THE FURTHERANCE OF RESEARCH IN ENGLISH LITERATURE. III) IN THE PROVISIONS OF SCHOLARSHIPS OR OTHER GRANTS FOR THE PROPAGATION OF SCANDINAVIAN STUDIES IN ENGLAND.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ludlow Trust Co Ltd
Tower Wharf
Cheese Lane
BRISTOL
BS2 0JJ
- Phone:
- 01173138200
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window