THE ST JAMES THE LESS LITCHFIELD COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
For the church and the area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hampshire
Governance
- 17 February 1983: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev COLIN FOX | Trustee | 04 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
THE LADY KATHARINE WILLS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHRISTOPHER WILLS | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.69k | £10.48k | £11.45k | £13.42k | £15.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.85k | £960 | £1.13k | £33.47k | £1.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 10 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 08 May 2024 | 93 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 03 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 16 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF SETTLEMENT DATED 5TH JANUARY 1983
Charitable objects
(A) THE REPAIR OF THE FABRIC OF THE CHURCH OF ST JAMES THE LESS LITCHFIELD AND THE MAINTENANCE AND UPKEEP OF THE SERVICES THEREIN; (B) THE MAKING OF GRANTS TO THE LITCHFIELD PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL FROM TIME TO TIME FOR THE RELIGIOUS AND OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WHITCHURCH WITH TUFTON AND LITCHFIELD; (C) THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A CHURCH HALL; (D) THE GENERAL PURPOSES OF SUCH CHARITABLE BODIES OR FOR SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AS SHALL BE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE.
Area of benefit
LICHFIELD
Contact information
- Address:
-
SAFFERY CHAMPNESS
MIDLAND HOUSE
2 POOLE ROAD
BOURNEMOUTH
BH2 5QY
- Phone:
- 01202204744
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window