Financial history THE MERRY BELLS VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 286769
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £40.14k £39.73k £41.78k £39.19k £44.28k
Total expenditure £27.07k £24.92k £45.65k £41.62k £30.28k
Income from government contracts £15.00k £15.12k £15.00k £15.00k £15.00k
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k £9.91k N/A N/A